SC H4078 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Priority Course Enrollment For Military-related Students, And To Define Necessary Terminology.
Title
Military Priority Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-2 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Amended |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |