SC H4077 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 52-11)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 247
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Definitions, To Create The "educational Credit For Exceptional Needs Children's Fund", To Provide For Governance And Administration Of The Fund, To Provide For The Manner In Which Grants Are Awarded, To Provide For Annual Limits On Income Tax Credits Available, To Specify The Manner In Which The Credit Is Claimed, To Provide That The Education Oversight Committee Is Responsible For Determining Which Schools Are Eligible, To Provide That The Education Oversight Committee Shall Establish An Advisory Committee, To Allow For An Income Tax Credit For Contributions To The Educational Credit For Exceptional Needs Children's Fund And For Tuition Payments Made To An Eligible School For An Exceptional Needs Child Within The Taxpayer's Custody Or Care, And To Provide That The Department Shall Conduct A Study Of The Exceptional Needs Tax Credit Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exceptional Needs Children's Fund, income tax credit, grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 247
2018-05-30 Effective date See Act
2018-05-18 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 247
2018-05-10HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
2018-05-10HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2018-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-05-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-01SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2018-05-01SenateRead second time
2018-05-01SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-16HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-15HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2018-02-15HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2018-02-15HouseRead second time
2018-02-15HouseAmended
2018-02-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole, Mace
2018-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2018-02-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2018-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4305 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1263780(n/a)See Bill Text
1263790(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4077&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20170330.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180213.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180215.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180425.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180426.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180501.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4077_20180502.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13938
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14885
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15274

Bill Comments

feedback