SC H4061 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Impose Certain Time Limits On The Availability Of These Proceedings.
Title
Federal tax formulas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Knotts, Massey, S.Martin | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Massey, S.Martin | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-04-28 | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time | |
2011-04-27 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-12 | Introduced and read first time |