SC H4046 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminate The Requirement That A County Committee Publish Certain Notices Regarding County Conventions In A Newspaper Having General Circulation In The County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County conventions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Chellis
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant, Burns, Chumley, Trantham, Caskey
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Morgan, Magnuson, Wooten, Ligon
2019-03-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bailey, Hewitt, Felder, B.Cox, Elliott
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Forrest, Huggins, Hixon, Hyde, Willis, Taylor
2019-03-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
2019-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7970(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback