SC H4029 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Create A Presumption That Retirement Is A Change Of Circumstance Justifying Termination Of Alimony When The Supporting Spouse Is Eligible To Receive Social Security Retirement Benefits, To Provide That The Court Should Decrease An Alimony Award If A Supported Spouse Is Entitled To Receive Certain Spousal Social Security Retirement Benefits, And To Provide That The Court Has The Discretion To Modify An Alimony Award At Whatever Age The Supporting Spouse Retires.
Title
Alimony awards
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Norman [R] | Rep. Jerry Govan [D] | Rep. John King [D] | Rep. Christopher Corley [R] |
Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. Terry Alexander [D] |
Rep. Mark Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 24 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-2 |
2016-04-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-8 |
2016-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-26 | House | Amended |
2016-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2016-04-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-20-16 |
2016-04-13 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander |
2016-03-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-13-16 |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1087 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary