SC H4027 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 745 Of 1967, As Amended, Relating To Renewable Water Resources (rewa) Formerly Known As The Western Carolina Regional Sewer Authority, So As To Amend Rewa's Service Area, Revise The Membership Of The Governing Commission, And To Require Rewa To Place A Conservation Easement On Certain Property And Make Certain Information Available Through The Freedom Of Information Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Renewable Water Resources (REWA)
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 113 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/19/21 | |
2021-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 98 | |
2021-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1 |
2021-05-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-11 |
2021-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |