SC H4022 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING ARTICLE 9 TO CHAPTER 31, TITLE 23 SO AS TO ENACT THE "SOUTH CAROLINA FIREARMS FREEDOM ACT", TO PROVIDE THAT A FIREARM, FIREARM ACCESSORY, OR AMMUNITION MANUFACTURED AND RETAINED IN SOUTH CAROLINA IS EXEMPT FROM FEDERAL REGULATION UNDER THE COMMERCE CLAUSE OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES.
Title
Enact The "south Carolina Firearms Freedom Act", To Provide That A Firearm, Firearm Accessory, Or Ammunition Manufactured And Retained In South Carolina Is Exempt From Federal Regulation Under The Commerce Clause Of The Constitution Of The United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-69 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-69 | |
2009-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-12 | |
2009-05-20 | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 HJ-31 | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time HJ-31 | |
2009-05-20 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Vick, Viers | |
2009-05-19 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-36 | |
2009-05-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gambrell, Rice, Owens | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-54 | |
2009-05-12 | Introduced and read first time HJ-54 |
Same As/Similar To
S0794 (Similar To) 2009-05-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4022&session=118 |