SC H4019 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Placement Of Infants At Designated Locations Without Criminal Liability, So As To Allow The Placement Of An Infant Not More Than One Year Old At A Safe Haven And To Change The Definition Of "infant".
Title
Infant safe haven placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-04-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |