SC H4014 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Supplemental Appropriations For Fiscal Year 2019-2020 To The Executive Budget Office For The Benefit Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control For The State's Public Health Response To The Covid-19 Virus And To Provide For Other Matters. - Ratified Title
Title
COVID-19; funding for DHEC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Act No. 116 | |
2020-03-19 | Effective date 03/19/20 | |
2020-03-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 129 | |
2020-03-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-119 Nays-0 |
2020-03-19 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-03-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-2 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19 |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |