SC H4011 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The New Harbor Island Bridge In Beaufort County The "george J. 'geordie' Madlinger Iii Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The Bridge Containing These Words.
Title
George J. Madlinger III Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
Rep. Michael Rivers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-04-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Rivers |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced |