SC H4010 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 51-17-140, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Maximum Acreage That May Be Acquired Under The Heritage Trust Program, So As To Remove The Maximum Acreage Limitation. - Ratified Title
Title
Heritage Trust program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 72 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 92 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tue., 4-9-19 |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |