SC H4008 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Juncture Of Calhoun Street And Mcarthur Avenue In The Town Of Dillon "major Bethea Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection That Contain This Designation.
Title
Major Bethea Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2015-05-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-28 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced |