SC H4000 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize The Essential Value And Importance Of South Carolina Native Plants To The State's History, Economy, Landscape, And Environment And To Designate October 16-20, 2017, The Third Week Of October, As "south Carolina Native Plant Week."
Title
SC Native Plant Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |