SC H4000 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Concurred in amendment HJ-21
Status: Introduced on April 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Concurred in amendment HJ-21
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO PROVIDE THAT PURSUANT TO ARTICLE III, SECTION 9 OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THIS STATE AND SECTION 2-1-180 OF THE 1976 CODE, WHEN THE RESPECTIVE HOUSES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY ADJOURN ON THURSDAY, MAY 21, 2009, NOT LATER THAN 5:00 P.M., EACH HOUSE SHALL STAND ADJOURNED TO MEET AT A TIME MUTUALLY AGREED UPON BY THE PRESIDENT PRO TEMPORE OF THE SENATE AND THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES NOT EARLIER THAN NOON ON TUESDAY, JUNE 16, 2009, FOR A PERIOD NOT TO EXCEED THREE STATEWIDE LEGISLATIVE DAYS FOR THE CONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN MATTERS, TO PROVIDE THAT WHEN EACH HOUSE ADJOURNS AFTER THIS THREE-DAY PERIOD NOT LATER THAN 5:00 P.M. ON THE THIRD LEGISLATIVE DAY, EACH HOUSE SHALL STAND ADJOURNED TO MEET AT A TIME MUTUALLY AGREED UPON BY THE PRESIDENT PRO TEMPORE OF THE SENATE AND THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES UPON CERTAIN OCCURRENCES AND FOR THE CONSIDERATION OF SPECIFIED MATTERS, AND TO PROVIDE THAT UNLESS ADJOURNED EARLIER, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY SHALL STAND ADJOURNED SINE DIE NO LATER THAN 5:00 P.M. ON MONDAY, JANUARY 11, 2010.
Title
Provide That Pursuant To Article Iii, Section 9 Of The Constitution Of This State And Section 2-1-180 Of The 1976 Code, When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, May 21, 2009, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet At A Time Mutually Agreed Upon By The President Pro Tempore Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Not Earlier Than Noon On Tuesday, June 16, 2009, For A Period Not To Exceed Three Statewide Legislative Days For The Consideration Of Certain Matters, To Provide That When Each House Adjourns After This Three-day Period Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On The Third Legislative Day, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet At A Time Mutually Agreed Upon By The President Pro Tempore Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Upon Certain Occurrences And For The Consideration Of Specified Matters, And To Provide That Unless Adjourned Earlier, The General Assembly Shall Stand Adjourned Sine Die No Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Monday, January 11, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Concurred in amendment HJ-21 | |
2009-05-07 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-38 | |
2009-05-07 | Adopted SJ-38 | |
2009-05-07 | Amended SJ-38 | |
2009-04-30 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary SJ-45 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-22 | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced SJ-22 | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate HJ-199 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4000&session=118 |