SC H3991 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 16-17-680, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Permits To Purchase Nonferrous Metals, Transportation And Sale Of Nonferrous Metals, And Various Offenses Associated With Nonferrous Metals, So As To Include In The Purview Of The Statute Procedures For The Lawful Purchase, Sale, And Possession Of Used, Detached Catalytic Converters Or Any Nonferrous Part Of One Unless Purchased, Sold, Or Possessed Under Certain Delineated Circumstances, And To Provide Increased And Tiered Penalties For Unlawful Conduct Related To Catalytic Converters. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonferrous Metals - Catalytic Converters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 80
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/18/21
2021-05-18 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 96
2021-05-06SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2021-05-06SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2021-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-119 Nays-0
2021-05-04HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2021-05-04HouseSenate amendment amended
2021-04-29HouseDebate adjourned
2021-04-28HouseDebate adjourned
2021-04-22SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2021-04-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-21SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2021-04-21SenateRead second time
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateCommittee Amendment Withdrawn
2021-04-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-19HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-03-18HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2021-03-18HouseRoll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
2021-03-18HouseRead second time
2021-03-18HouseAmended
2021-03-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen, B.Cox, Elliott, Erickson, S.Williams, Rivers
2021-03-17HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-18-21
2021-03-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-03-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0590 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Rice, Senn, Kimbrell
H3940 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1617680(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3991&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210302.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210311.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210318.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210319.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210331.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210401.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210421.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210422.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3991_20210504.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/H3991%202021-03-18%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18703
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19250
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19504
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19574

Bill Comments 750

feedback