SC H3989 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Court To Take Into Consideration The Disability And Ways In Which To Accommodate The Disability To Preserve Or Reunify The Family; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Persons with Disabilities Right to Parent Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [D] | Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. Jenny Horne [R] |
Rep. Peter McCoy [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. Joseph McEachern [D] | Rep. Donna Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Coleman (ch), Shealy, Turner |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy, Thayer, McEachern, Hicks |
2016-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne |
2015-04-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1695 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 2575 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |