SC H3989 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Change The Term" Mental Retardation" To "intellectual Disability" And The Term "mentally Retarded" To "person With Intellectual Disability"; To Provide That The Terms "intellectual Disability" And "person With Intellectual Disability" Have Replaced And Have The Same Meanings As The Former Terms "mental Retardation" And "mentally Retarded"; And To Direct State Agencies, Boards, Committees, And Commissions And Political Subdivisions Of The State And The Code Commissioner To Substitute The Term "intellectual Disability" For "mental Retardation" And The Term "person With Intellectual Disability" For "mentally Retarded" In Rules, Regulations, Policies, Procedures, Statutes, Ordinances, And Publications When These Rules, Regulations, Policies, Procedures, Statutes, Ordinances, Or Publications Are Amended, Revised, Or Republished.
Title
Definition of terms used in the health facility licensure act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3920 (Similar To) 2011-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
H4058 (Similar To) 2011-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
S0687 (Similar To) 2011-06-20 - Act No. 47
S0695 (Similar To) 2011-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
H4058 (Similar To) 2011-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
S0687 (Similar To) 2011-06-20 - Act No. 47
S0695 (Similar To) 2011-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3989&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3989_20110330.htm |