SC H3986 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Make Conforming Changes; And To Direct The Code Commissioner To Make Certain Conforming Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC ABLE Account renamed SC STABLE Account Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 88
2019-06-10 Effective date 05/24/19
2019-05-24 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 109
2019-05-21SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2019-05-21HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-09SenateConference committee appointed Cromer, McElveen, Corbin
2019-05-09HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Willis, Rose, Caskey
2019-05-09SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-30SenateRecalled from Committee on Finance
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-21HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-03-21HouseRoll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
2019-03-21HouseRead second time
2019-03-21HouseAmended
2019-03-20HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-21-19
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2019-03-19HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-20-19
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
2019-02-27HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-19-19
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2019-02-21HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 2-27-19
2019-02-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1261140(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3986&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190214A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190322.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190430.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3986_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16163
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16666
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16892
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16896

Bill Comments

feedback