SC H3972 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish That The Submission Of A Land Development Or Land Use Plan Is Not A Prerequisite To Recording And That A Local Government May Require The Grantee To File A Plat At The Time The Deed Is Recorded
Title
Transfer of undeveloped property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Act No. 144 | |
2016-03-16 | Effective date 03/14/16 | |
2016-03-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-03-10 | Ratified R 148 | |
2016-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Corbin, M.B.Matthews |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |