SC H3961 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue "autism Awareness" Special License Plates.
Title
Special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-30 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.L.Brown, Whipper |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |