SC H3930 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Additional Circumstances When Certain Persons Who Carry A Concealable Weapon Must Leave Or Remove The Weapon From The Premises And To Make A Conforming Change; And To Provide That This Act Applies Only To Individuals Who Legally May Purchase A Firearm From A Properly Licensed And Certified Firearms Dealer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handguns

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Table The Bill (Y: 28 N: 77 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 30 N: 71 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Recede (Y: 24 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 39 N: 67 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To Ways And Means (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 24 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 26 N: 75 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 70 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Invoke The Previous Question (cloture) (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-11SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-06HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-05HouseRoll call Yeas-64 Nays-46
2017-04-05HouseRead second time
2017-04-05HouseAmended
2017-04-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Murphy
2017-04-04HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
2017-03-30HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-4-17
2017-03-29HouseDebate interrupted
2017-03-23HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-03-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer, Gagnon, Taylor, Whitmire, Hamilton, Forrester, Huggins, D.C.Moss, Hiott, G.M.Smith, Spires, Putnam, Toole, Bradley, W.Newton, Erickson, Arrington, Lucas
2017-03-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss, Pope, Simrill, Martin, Atwater
2017-03-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: White, Henderson, Loftis, Burns, Chumley, Long, G.R.Smith, Bedingfield, Stringer, Bannister, Fry, Elliott, Hixon, Thayer, Collins, Yow, West, S.Rivers
2017-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Lowe, Jordan, Duckworth
2017-03-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett, Forrest
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0449 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Fanning, Goldfinch, Rice, Senn
H3700 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162320(n/a)See Bill Text
1623420(n/a)See Bill Text
1623430(n/a)See Bill Text
1623460(n/a)See Bill Text
1623465(n/a)See Bill Text
1623510(n/a)See Bill Text
2331215(n/a)See Bill Text
2331220(n/a)See Bill Text
2331225(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3930&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3930_20170307.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3930_20170322.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3930_20170405.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12994
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12995
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12996
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12997
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13058
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13062
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13065
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13066
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13067
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13068
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13069
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13071

Bill Comments

feedback