SC H3928 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The National Oceanic And Atmospheric Administration Rename The Portion Of The Navigational Channel Adjacent To The City Of Charleston Waterfront Consisting Of The Charleston Maritime Center, International African American Museum, And The Pedestrian Walkway Of The Arthur Ravenel, Jr. Bridge To "riley Reach" In Order To Honor The Legacy Of Mayor Joseph P. Riley, Jr.
Title
Mayor Joseph P. Riley, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced |