SC H3927 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes, To Provide The Authority Annually Shall Report Related Activities To The Joint Bond Review Committee, And To Provide The Authority Shall Publish Lists Of Bonds Approved By The Authority And Relevant Information On Its Website; And To Make The Provisions Of This Act Effective June 1, 2017
Title
Interest rates on bonds approved by Fiscal Accountability Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Simrill [R] | Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. James Smith [D] | Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] |
Rep. Murrell Smith [R] | Rep. David Weeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 80 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 117 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-3 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-23 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-5 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Weeks |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith, Bernstein |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |