SC H3917 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declare Tuesday, March 21, 2017, "national Guard Day" In South Carolina And To Recognize And Honor The Many Sacrifices And Valuable Contributions The South Carolina National Guard Makes To Protect The Freedom, Democracy, And Security Of Our State And Nation.
Title
National Guard Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on General |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3917&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3917_20170307.htm |