SC H3900 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reapportion The Specific Election Districts From Which Members Of The Spartanburg County School District 5 Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected Beginning With The 2015 School District Elections, To Designate A Map Number On Which These Election Districts Are Delineated, To Provide Demographic Information Pertaining To The Reapportioned Election Districts, And To Provide For The Trustees' Terms And Manner Of Election
Title
Spartanburg County School District 5 Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Norman Brannon [R] | Rep. Derham Cole [R] | Rep. Michael Forrester [R] |
Rep. Donna Wood [R] | Rep. Edward Tallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Act No. 106 | |
2015-05-14 | Effective date 05/07/15 | |
2015-05-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Ratified R 41 | |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Amended |
2015-04-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-16 | House | Recalled from Spartanburg Delegation |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |