SC H3896 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 311 In Berkeley County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 176 To Mudville Road "caldwell Pinckney, Sr. Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
Caldwell Pinckney, Sr. Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. William Crosby [R] | Rep. James Merrill [R] |
Rep. Edward Southard [R] | Rep. Samuel Rivers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-15 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced |