SC H3895 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete An Obsolete Reference; To Redesignate Certain Sections Of The Code; And To Repeal Sections 1-11-360, 2-7-62, 44-6-175, And 48-22-20 All Relating To The Duties Of The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office
Title
Revenue and Fiscal Affairs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 246 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 07/01/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 246 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 11 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 62 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 71 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 73 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 7 | 78 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 2 | 85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 10 | 790 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 6 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 6 | 175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 6 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 22 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |