SC H3882 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Definition Of Involuntary Manslaughter To Include The Sale Or Delivery Of Controlled Substances, Their Analogues, Or Other Unlawful Substances That Cause The Death Of The User When Ingested, And To Provide A Penalty.
Title
Involuntary manslaughter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Martin, Erickson, V.S.Moss, G.R.Smith, Long, Elliott, Taylor, Hixon, Arrington, Bennett, W.Newton, Knight, Hewitt |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0083 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3882&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3882_20170302.htm |