SC H3881 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Each Licensed Manufactured Housing Retail Dealer Location Must Have One Authorized Official Representing The Dealership, To Provide An Authorized Official Who Is Not The Dealer Must Hold A Manufactured Home Retail Salesperson Or Retail Dealer License, And To Provide The Manufactured Housing Board Must Be Notified In Writing Within Twenty Days If The Authorized Official Changes
Title
Manufactured housing dealers
Sponsors
Rep. McLain Toole [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] |
Rep. Carl Anderson [D] | Rep. Michael Forrester [R] | Rep. Mike Ryhal [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Act No. 135 | |
2016-02-22 | Effective date 02/16/16 | |
2016-02-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-02-11 | Ratified R 138 | |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-9 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-06-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2015-06-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-28 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0637 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry