SC H3873 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Society Hill Road In Darlington County From Its Intersection With Greenfield Road To Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 34 "colonel Christopher N. Williamson Road" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Col. Christopher Williamson Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions