SC H3868 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Adopted HJ-45
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Adopted HJ-45
Summary
A HOUSE RESOLUTION TO MEMORIALIZE THE SECRETARY OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, THE HONORABLE RAY H. LAHOOD, TO SET ASIDE THE FUNDS NECESSARY TO ACQUIRE THE RIGHT-OF-WAY AND BUILD THE APPROXIMATELY TWELVE-MILE PORTION OF INTERSTATE 73 FROM ITS INTERSECTION WITH SOUTH CAROLINA HIGHWAY 34 TO ITS INTERSECTION WITH UNITED STATES HIGHWAY 501.
Title
Memorialize The Secretary Of The United States Department Of Transportation, The Honorable Ray H. Lahood, To Set Aside The Funds Necessary To Acquire The Right-of-way And Build The Approximately Twelve-mile Portion Of Interstate 73 From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 34 To Its Intersection With United States Highway 501.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Adopted HJ-45 | |
2009-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-219 | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-29 | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced HJ-29 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3868&session=118 |