SC H3867 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt All Property Devoted To Housing Low Income Residents If The Property Is Owned By An Instrumentality Of A Nonprofit Housing Corporation.
Title
Property tax exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. Jackie Hayes [D] | Rep. Michael Anthony [D] |
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Jackson Whipper [D] | Rep. Robert Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Motion To Carry The Bill Over (Y: 5 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Motion To Carry The Bill Over (Y: 5 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-3 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |