SC H3866 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 1-7-95 So As To Clarify That, When The Attorney General Proceeds In The Public Interest, The Attorney General Does Not Undertake Representation Of State Agencies And Cannot Be Considered To Have Possession, Custody, Or Control Over State Agency Documents Or Electronically Stored Information; And By Adding Section 39-5-55 So As To Specify That The Attorney General Is Acting In The Public Interest Of The State In Unfair Trade Practice Proceedings, And To Provide An Exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney General

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 110 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-27HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-110
2024-02-27HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2024-02-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2024-02-21SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2024-02-20SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2024-02-20SenateRead second time
2024-02-20SenateAmended
2024-02-15SenateAmended
2024-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2023-03-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-29SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2023-03-17SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Senn (ch), McLeod, Loftis, Adams, Stephens
2023-03-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2023-03-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2023-03-07HouseRoll call Yeas-114 Nays-0
2023-03-07HouseRead second time
2023-03-07HouseAmended
2023-03-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2023-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-02HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0486 (Similar To) 2023-03-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Senn (ch), McLeod, Loftis, Adams, Stephens

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1795(n/a)See Bill Text
39555(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3866&session=125&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230202.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230308.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230329.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230330.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20230301.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20240214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20240215.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20240220.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3866_20240221.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/fiscalimpactstatements/H3866%202023-03-01%20amended.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/fiscalimpactstatements/H3866%202023-03-07%20amended.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/fiscalimpactstatements/H3866%202024-02-20%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=22183
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=23749
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=23787

Bill Comments

feedback