SC H3865 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 244
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Add Certain Other Unlawful Employment Practices In Regard To An Applicant For Employment Or An Employee With Limitations Because Of Pregnancy, Childbirth, Or Related Medical Conditions, To Provide For Notice And Applicability To New And Current Employees To Whom Specific Provisions Apply, And To Provide For Certain Public Education Efforts By The Human Affairs Commission; And To Provide That The Human Affairs Commission With Stated Limitations May Promulgate Regulations To Carry Out This Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Pregnancy Accommodations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 52 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 244
2018-05-30 Effective date 05/17/18
2018-05-17 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 244
2018-05-10HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
2018-05-10HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2018-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2018-05-08SenateRead second time
2018-05-08SenateAmended
2018-05-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-01SenateAmended
2018-05-01SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2018-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Senn, R.J.Cash
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-52 Nays-50
2017-04-04HouseRead second time
2017-04-04HouseAmended
2017-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight
2017-04-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-03-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, J.E.Smith
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-03-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11330(n/a)See Bill Text
11380(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3865&session=122&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20170228.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20170329.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20170404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180221.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180222.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180501.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180502A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3865_20180509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13044
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15078
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15271

Bill Comments 750

feedback