SC H3853 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require That Such Instruction Must Be Approved By The Charter School's Sponsor Rather Than The State Department Of Education
Title
Alternative Education Campus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Act No. 288 | |
2014-07-08 | Effective date 06/12/14 | |
2014-06-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-09 | Ratified R 318 | |
2014-06-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2014-06-05 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 40 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |