SC H3851 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require Birth Centers To Be Accredited And To Comply With State Statutes And Regulations, To Require Births Planned To Occur At Birth Centers To Be Evaluated By Professional Staff To Assess For Risk Status And To Document Evaluations In Client Files, To Address Professional Requirements For Staff Members Who Provide Patient Care, To Require Development Of Guidelines, Policies And Procedures Addressing, Among Other Practices, The Transfer Of Clients To Hospitals, To Require Birth Centers To Collect And Report Data, And To Establish A Deadline For Birth Centers In Operation To Become Accredited.
Title
Birthing centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1143 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs