SC H3849 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-105
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-105
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Personally Identifiable Information In Certain Evaluations Of Public School Educators And Student Teachers From Public Disclosure
Title
Public school educators and student teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House: Override Governors Veto (Y: 0 N: 105 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Veto sustained Yeas-0 Nays-105 |
2016-05-27 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 200 | |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-1 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-19 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |