SC H3848 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The State Board Of Education And Education Oversight Committee Shall Incorporate Instruction On Certain Founding Principles Of The United States Into Required Studies Of The United States Constitution And The South Carolina Social Studies Standards, To Specify Certain Minimum Content Requirements, To Provide The State Department Of Education Biennially Shall Report On The Implementation Of This Act To The General Assembly, And To Provide The Department Shall Offer Professional Development Opportunities Regarding Founding Principles Instruction To Teachers
Title
SC Founding Principles Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Act No. 192 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date 05/26/16 | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 199 | |
2016-05-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2016-05-18 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-15 | House | Amended |
2016-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2015-03-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine |
2015-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kennedy |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |