SC H3825 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Release Of Prescription Report Cards To Practitioners.
Title
Prescription report cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-14 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-21 | House | Amended |
2018-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18 |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jordan, B.Newton, Martin, Erickson, Long, Bradley, Weeks, Taylor |
2017-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2017-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Arrington, Allison, Tallon, Elliott, Hamilton |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 53 | 1650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 1655 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |