SC H3823 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminate References To Certificate Of Need Requirements; To Repeal Sections 44-7-160, 44-7-170, 44-7-180, 44-7-190, 44-7-200, 44-7-210, 44-7-220, 44-7-225, 44-7-230, And 44-7-240 All Relating To The Certificate Of Need Program; To Rename Article 3, Chapter 7, Title 44 As "state Health Facility Licensure Act"; And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Facility Licensure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Wooten, Ballentine, Gilliam, Toole, Huggins, Forrest, Caskey, Herbkersman, Lowe, Bennett, Kimmons, Stringer, Bailey, Hewitt, McCoy
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis, Daning
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Chumley, Long, Magnuson, Loftis, Morgan
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Young
2019-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447110(n/a)See Bill Text
447120(n/a)See Bill Text
447130(n/a)See Bill Text
447140(n/a)See Bill Text
447150(n/a)See Bill Text
447160(n/a)See Bill Text
447170(n/a)See Bill Text
447180(n/a)See Bill Text
447190(n/a)See Bill Text
447200(n/a)See Bill Text
447210(n/a)See Bill Text
447220(n/a)See Bill Text
447225(n/a)See Bill Text
447230(n/a)See Bill Text
447240(n/a)See Bill Text
447320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback