SC H3822 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Notify The Code Commissioner Of Additions, Deletions, And Rescheduling Of Substances
Title
Controlled substance schedules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Act No. 166 | |
2018-05-11 | Effective date 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Ratified R 178 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper |
2017-05-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jordan, B.Newton, Martin, Erickson, West, Lowe, Ryhal, Atwater, Willis, Jefferson, W.Newton, Bennett, Crosby, Long |
2017-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Arrington, Allison, Tallon, Hamilton, Felder, Elliott |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |