SC H3817 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Pharmacies And Other Entities To Register As A Collector To Receive Controlled Substances As Part Of Law Enforcement Controlled Substance Take-back Events And Operate Controlled Substance Mail-back Programs And To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Facilitate And Encourage Registration And Participation
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 76 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 112 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell, Collins |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jordan, B.Newton, Martin, G.M.Smith, Yow, D.C.Moss, Wheeler, Erickson, V.S.Moss, Long, G.R.Smith, Magnuson, Bradley, Weeks, Taylor |
2017-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Arrington, Allison, Tallon, Hamilton, Elliott |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |