SC H3813 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Ligon
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Ligon
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Express The General Assembly's Unwavering Support For The Electoral College, And To Urge The Governor And Attorney General Of South Carolina To Litigate Aggressively Against Any Effort To Repeal Or Nullify It, Including The Implementation Of The National Popular Vote Interstate Compact.
Title
Electoral college
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Sandy McGarry [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Davey Hiott [R] |
Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Ligon |
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hiott, Forrest |
2021-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3813&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3813_20210203.htm |