SC H3804 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "fundamental Fairness In College Discipline Act Of 2019" By Adding Article 4 To Chapter 101, Title 59 Entitled "disciplinary Procedure Due Process", To Define Necessary Terms, To Establish The Requirements Of A Proceeding, To Enumerate The Rights Of A Student Who Is Subject To A Proceeding, To Establish Standards For The Disclosure Of Evidence Relating To The Proceeding, To Require Written Statements Entered As Evidence To Be Notarized, To Prohibit Certain Documents From Being Used As Evidence Without The Consent Of Both Parties, To Allow For The Informal Disposition Of A Proceeding In Certain Circumstances, To Prohibit Irrelevant, Immaterial, Or Unduly Repetitive Evidence From Being Admitted, To Apply The Standards For Privilege Of The State To A Party In A Proceeding, To Allow The Submission Of Evidence In Written Form In Certain Circumstances, To Require A Record Of The Proceeding Be Made And To Enumerate The Required Contents Of The Record, To Allow A Party To Request A Recording Of The Proceeding For Transcription, To Require The Presiding Person To Be Impartial, To Establish Standards For The Presiding Person To Make A Decision, To Require An Institution To Provide A Student The Internal Appeals Procedure If The Decision Of The Institution Is Adverse To The Student, To Allow The Student Or Institution To Appeal To The Circuit Court Or Administrative Law Court, To Establish A Presumption Of Nonviolation For The Student And The Burden Of Proof For The Institution, To Require Any Punishment To Be Reasonable And Proportionate To The Violation, To Allow The Circuit Court Or Administrative Law Court To Issue An Injunction And Allow For The Award Of Attorney's Fees And Costs, And To Allow An Institution Immediately To Suspend A Student For Alleged Misconduct In Certain Circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fundamental Fairness in College Discipline Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2020-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary
2020-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrester, Allison
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Elliott
2019-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Hewitt
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback