SC H3804 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Pick-up Truck With A Fifth Wheel Assembly May Not Tow More Than One Separate Trailing Vehicle, And To Provide A Maximum Length For This Combination Of Vehicles.
Title
Pick-up trucks with a fifth wheel assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2017-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chumley, Delleney, Burns, Long, G.R.Smith, Bedingfield, V.S.Moss, Herbkersman, Yow, Hixon, King |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |