SC H3790 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Bamberg County Water And Sewer Authority; To Provide For Its Duties, Responsibilities, And Powers; And To Provide For The Appointment And Terms Of The Authority's Members
Title
Bamberg County Water and Sewer Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 295 | |
2012-07-02 | Effective date 06/28/12 | |
2012-06-28 | Veto overridden Ayes-20 Nays-10 | |
2012-06-28 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-55 Nays-5 | |
2012-06-27 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-06-22 | Ratified R 319 | |
2012-06-21 | Ordered enrolled for ratification | |
2012-06-21 | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference report adopted | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference committee appointed Sellers, Hosey, Merrill | |
2012-06-21 | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference powers granted | |
2012-06-21 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference report adopted | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference committee appointed Hutto, Matthews, and Shoopman | |
2012-06-21 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-21 | Free conference powers granted | |
2012-06-07 | Conference committee appointed Sellers, Hosey, Merrill | |
2012-06-07 | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Matthews, and Shoopman | |
2012-06-07 | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-85 | |
2012-06-07 | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment | |
2012-06-07 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-06-07 | Amended | |
2011-03-16 | Roll call Ayes-1 Nays-0 | |
2011-03-16 | Read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, March 9, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |