SC H3789 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Period In Which Drivers' Licenses, Certain Commercial Driver Licenses, And Commercial Driver Instruction Permits Are Valid, To Revise The Fees To Obtain Driver's Licenses, Certain Commercial Driver Licenses, And Special Identification Cards, To Revise The Documents That Must Be Provided To The Department Of Motor Vehicles To Obtain A Veteran Designation On A Driver's License Or A Special Identification Card, To Make Technical Changes, To Provide That A Person Is Permitted To Have Only One Driver's License Or Identification Card, And To Delete The Provision That Pertains To The Renewal Or Reissuance Of A Commercial Driver Instruction Permit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 115 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 86
2019-06-10 Effective date 11/24/19
2019-05-24 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 107
2019-05-21HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2019-05-21HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-09HouseConference committee appointed Thigpen, Yow, Bennett
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Grooms, Johnson, Climer
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-115
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-28HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-27HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
2019-03-27HouseRead second time
2019-03-27HouseAmended
2019-03-26HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-27-19
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown, Erickson, Bradley, Huggins, Forrest, Taylor
2019-03-20HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-26-19
2019-03-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561140(n/a)See Bill Text
5612080(n/a)See Bill Text
561210(n/a)See Bill Text
5612100(n/a)See Bill Text
5613350(n/a)See Bill Text
56135(n/a)See Bill Text
56140(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3789&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190129.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190313.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190314.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190329.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3789_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16193
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16720
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16825
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16881
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16886

Bill Comments

feedback