SC H3786 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 1-1-1210, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Annual Salaries Of State Constitutional Officers, So As To Provide That Beginning With Fiscal Year 2022-2023 Salaries For The State Constitutional Officers Must Be Based On Recommendations By The Agency Head Salary Commission To The General Assembly; To Amend Section 8-11-160, Relating To The Agency Head Salary Commission And Salary Increases For Agency Heads, So As To Provide That The Agency Head Salary Commission Must Make Recommendations To The General Assembly For The Salaries For State Constitutional Officers; And To Amend Section 8-11-165, Relating To Salary And Fringe Benefit Surveys, So As To Provide That Salary Surveys Be Conducted For State Constitutional Officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional officers salaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateRead second time
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2021-05-05SenatePolled out of committee Finance
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-07HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-4
2021-04-07HouseRead second time
2021-04-07HouseAmended
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111210(n/a)See Bill Text
811160(n/a)See Bill Text
811165(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback