SC H3786 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Archives And History, Relating To Rehabilitation Of Designated Historic Buildings, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4135, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Rehabilitation of designated historic buildings (D. No. 4135)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Committed to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-22 | Recalled from Committee on Education | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0777 (Similar To) 2011-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs