SC H3784 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Masters-in-equity Serving On July 1, 2015, To Elect To Become A Member.
Title
Retirement system for judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit Bill (Y: 30 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith |
2015-04-29 | House | Committed to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-04-28 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Whipper |
2015-04-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lowe |
2015-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |